This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 11:36:44 (UTC).

ALEJANDRA GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 ALEJANDRA GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7940

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARMICHAEL AN INDIVIDUAL DAVID

GERBASI AN INDIVIDUAL KATHERINE

SILVA-ESPINOSA AN INDIVIDUAL ARIA SONORA

MATIS AN INDIVIDUAL AARON WALKER

PEARL AN INDIVIDUAL CHRISTOPHER

FANGUE AN INDIVIDUAL MORGAN

TOOLEY AN INDIVIDUAL ELIZABETH

DE LEON AN INDIVIDUAL SAMANTHA

RHOADS AN INDIVIDUAL KATELYNN

REYNA AN INDIVIDUAL ALICIA

SALAZAR AN INDIVIDUAL DIANA

SIMS AN INDIVIDUAL DANYELLE LEAH

MAGHELLI AN INDIVIDUAL ENRICO

WILSON AN INDIVIDUAL ERIC

FULTON AN INDIVIDUAL TIMOTHY

THOMPSON AN INDIVIDUAL STEPHEN

MUNTEAN AN INDIVIDUAL LACRAMIOARA

Defendants

SANTA MONICA POLICE DEPARTMENT A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AZARI SARA ESQ.

CARPENTER JOHN C ESQ.

CARPENTER JOHN C

Defendant Attorneys

CARDONA GEORGE INTERIM CITY ATTORNEY

RAMIREZ EUGENE P. ESQ.

SPRADLIN DANIEL K. ESQ.

ROBERTS DANIEL S. ESQ.

ROBERTS DANIEL SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT AND REFERRED TO DEPA...) OF 12/15/2021

12/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT AND REFERRED TO DEPA...) OF 12/15/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT AND REFERRED TO DEPA...)

12/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT AND REFERRED TO DEPA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;)

12/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;) OF 12/17/2021

12/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;) OF 12/17/2021

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

8/27/2021: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Substitution of Attorney

9/13/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

9/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

8/27/2021: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/6/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;)

8/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;) OF 08/17/2021

8/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;) OF 08/17/2021

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • Hearing01/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:08 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court;) of 12/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Docketat 4:39 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Remand from Federal Court and Referred to Depa...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Remand from Federal Court and Referred to Depa...) of 12/15/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by BEVERLY HILLS POLICE DEPARTMENT, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Remand or No Remand) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALEJANDRA GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHANCE BROWN, an Individual (Plaintiff); STEPHEN THOMPSON, an Individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALEJANDRA GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHANCE BROWN, an Individual (Plaintiff); STEPHEN THOMPSON, an Individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALEJANDRA GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHANCE BROWN, an Individual (Plaintiff); STEPHEN THOMPSON, an Individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by ALEJANDRA GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHANCE BROWN, an Individual (Plaintiff); STEPHEN THOMPSON, an Individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALEJANDRA GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHANCE BROWN, an Individual (Plaintiff); STEPHEN THOMPSON, an Individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALEJANDRA GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHANCE BROWN, an Individual (Plaintiff); STEPHEN THOMPSON, an Individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALEJANDRA GARCIA, an Individual (Plaintiff); CHANCE BROWN, an Individual (Plaintiff); STEPHEN THOMPSON, an Individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA MONICA POLICE DEPARTMENT A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMIREZ, EUGENE P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPRADLIN DANIEL