This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 17:40:17 (UTC).

ALEJANDRA DOLORES LOPEZ VS READY PAC PRODUCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 ALEJANDRA DOLORES LOPEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against READY PAC PRODUCE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6050

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ ALEJANDRA DOLORES

Defendants

READY PAC PRODUCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BONDUELLE FRESH AMERICAS AN ENTITY UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Defendant Attorney

GURNICK MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SARA E. BROWN IN ADVANCE OF THE POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

6/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SARA E. BROWN IN ADVANCE OF THE POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE RE COURT'S MINUTE ORDER

5/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE RE COURT'S MINUTE ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [JOINT] FOR BINDING ARBITRATION

4/30/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [JOINT] FOR BINDING ARBITRATION

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/5/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

3/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/21/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO PURPORTED EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS

2/21/2020: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO PURPORTED EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS BY DEFENDANTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ALEJANDRA DOLORES LOPEZ

2/21/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS BY DEFENDANTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ALEJANDRA DOLORES LOPEZ

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIA AISPURO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIA AISPURO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/27/2020: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS

2/27/2020: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alejandra Dolores Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF SARA E. BROWN IN ADVANCE OF THE POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by Alejandra Dolores Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Jury Trial ((7 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice (Re Court's Minute Order); Filed by READY PAC PRODUCE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); BONDUELLE FRESH AMERICAS, an entity unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order ([JOINT] FOR BINDING ARBITRATION); Filed by READY PAC PRODUCE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); BONDUELLE FRESH AMERICAS, an entity unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Naveen Kabir in Support of Defendants Motion To Compel Arbitration); Filed by READY PAC PRODUCE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); BONDUELLE FRESH AMERICAS, an entity unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by READY PAC PRODUCE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); BONDUELLE FRESH AMERICAS, an entity unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by READY PAC PRODUCE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); BONDUELLE FRESH AMERICAS, an entity unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Alejandra Dolores Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alejandra Dolores Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alejandra Dolores Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alejandra Dolores Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alejandra Dolores Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less