This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 14:28:11 (UTC).

ALEJANDRA BECERRA VS FRANCISCO SAUCEDO-GUTIERREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 ALEJANDRA BECERRA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANCISCO SAUCEDO-GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0656

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BECERRA ALEJANDRA

Defendants

SAUCEDO-GUTIERREZ FRANCISCO

TUTTLE FAMILY ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EISENBERG GARY CARL

EISENBERG JASON G

Defendant Attorney

YERZINKYAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/8/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2024
  • Hearing08/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • Hearing10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Francisco Saucedo-Gutierrez (Defendant); Tuttle Family Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Francisco Saucedo-Gutierrez (Defendant); Tuttle Family Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alejandra Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alejandra Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alejandra Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alejandra Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alejandra Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TUTTLE FAMILY ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YERZINKYAN MICHAEL