This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 06:24:32 (UTC).

ALEANDER OLSHANSKY VS MIKHAIL CHEBAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 ALEANDER OLSHANSKY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MIKHAIL CHEBAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0771

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLSHANSKY ALEANDER

Defendants

SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC

STAR VLADIE AKA VLADIMIR ARNOLDOVICH STAROSELSKY

CHEBAN MIKHAIL

AIRSTAR GROUP INC.

Not Classified By Court

UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLEYMAN LEON

Defendant Attorney

PAULOS NICHOLAS

Other Attorneys

KASRELIOVICH BORISLAV

 

Court Documents

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

1/6/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Motion for Leave to Intervene

1/7/2021: Motion for Leave to Intervene

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Association of Attorney

6/23/2020: Association of Attorney

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALEXANDER

8/6/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALEXANDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY C...)

8/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY C...)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/31/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SLAV KASRELIOVICH RE CASE STATUS

9/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SLAV KASRELIOVICH RE CASE STATUS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

PI General Order

4/4/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Complaint

3/28/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/29/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • Hearing03/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Hearing07/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave NOTICE OF MOTION BY UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE, LLC FOR APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND FILE A COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Hearing04/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Intervene; Filed by SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE, LLC (Defendant); United Specialty Insurance Company (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by MIKHAIL CHEBAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency C...) of 08/25/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Alexander); Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALEXANDER OLSHANSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED SPECIALTY INS. CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC is a litigant