This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2022 at 19:22:08 (UTC).

ALDO M CHAPA VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SANITATION DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 ALDO M CHAPA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SANITATION DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4794

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

ANN I. JONES

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAPA ALDO M.

Defendant

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SANITATION DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LYON LAW PC

LYON GEOFFREY CLEVELAND

LYON GEOFFREY C.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

TEBBE WILLIAM J.

TEBBE WILLIAM JAMES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER PLAINTIFFS PETITION FOR WRIT OF MA...)

9/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER PLAINTIFFS PETITION FOR WRIT OF MA...)

Petition for Writ of Mandate

7/23/2020: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

7/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

Notice of Ruling

5/4/2020: Notice of Ruling

Judgment - JUDGMENT NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR JUDGMENT

7/23/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR JUDGMENT

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

7/8/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/30/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4/5/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATED [PROPOSED] AMENDED JUDGMENT; NOT...) OF 02/16/2021

2/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATED [PROPOSED] AMENDED JUDGMENT; NOT...) OF 02/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATED [PROPOSED] AMENDED JUDGMENT; NOT...)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATED [PROPOSED] AMENDED JUDGMENT; NOT...)

Stipulation for Judgment

2/16/2021: Stipulation for Judgment

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/1/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Reply - REPLY ISO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE TO PAY JUDGMENT

9/3/2020: Reply - REPLY ISO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE TO PAY JUDGMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. TEBBE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/25/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. TEBBE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION

6/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION

6/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION

Jury Instructions - PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION TO WHICH DEFENDANT OBJECTS

12/4/2018: Jury Instructions - PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION TO WHICH DEFENDANT OBJECTS

Exhibit List - JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

12/4/2018: Exhibit List - JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by County of Los Angeles Sanitation District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Aldo M. Chapa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Geoffrey C. Lyon (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulated [Proposed] Amended Judgment; Not...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Filed by Aldo M. Chapa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulated [Proposed] Amended Judgment; Not...) of 02/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate (Ordering Government Defendant to Pay Judgment Costs, Fees, and Interest of $1,001,953.17 (Res ID1804)) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Plaintiff?s Petition for Writ of Ma...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketReply (ISO Petition for Writ of Mandate to Pay Judgment); Filed by Aldo M. Chapa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Aldo M. Chapa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Aldo M. Chapa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN EMPLOYMENT AND RELATED CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aldo M. Chapa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4794    Hearing Date: September 08, 2020    Dept: 73

9/8/2020

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

ALDO M. CHAPA v. COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SANITATION DISTRICT (BC664794)

Counsel for Plaintiff/petitioner: Geoffrey Lyon (Lyon Law PC)

Counsel for Defendant/respondent: William Tebbe (Musick Peeler)

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE ORDERING GOVERNMENT DEFENDANT TO PAY JUDGMENT, COSTS, FEES, AND INTEREST OF $1,001,953.17 (filed 7/23/2020)

TENTATIVE RULING

The court will hear oral argument regarding Plaintiff’s position on the 7% interest rate versus the 10% interest rate and why Plaintiff felt compelled to file a writ rather than a stipulated, revised judgment with a corrected post-judgment interest rate pursuant to the mandated 7 percent rate against public entities.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYON GEOFFREY C. ESQ.