This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2022 at 13:46:30 (UTC).

ALDA ESCOBAR VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 ALDA ESCOBAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3024

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESCOBAR ALDA

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIZRAHI GUY

Defendant Attorney

OH ROBERT SAEHAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING FOR A CONTINUED INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE HEARING

11/4/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING FOR A CONTINUED INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

11/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Case Management Order

11/3/2022: Case Management Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/03/2022

11/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/03/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Statement of the Case

10/28/2022: Statement of the Case

Statement of the Case

10/25/2022: Statement of the Case

Case Management Statement

10/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/28/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/28/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SCHEDULED INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SCHEDULED INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WITH SONG-BEVERLY ACT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ADDENDUM AND ATTACHMENT "A"

4/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WITH SONG-BEVERLY ACT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ADDENDUM AND ATTACHMENT "A"

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

4/20/2022: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

Answer

5/23/2022: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

8/5/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

9/6/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/6/2022: Case Management Statement

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling FOR A CONTINUED INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE HEARING; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/27/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketJury Trial with a 5-7 day estimate scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketAddress for Guy Mizrahi (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alda Escobar (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alda Escobar (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alda Escobar (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yolanda Orozco in Department 31 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OH, ROBERT S.