This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 02:34:57 (UTC).

ALCOR SOLUTIONS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC., A DELAWARE CORPROATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 ALCOR SOLUTIONS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC , A DELAWARE CORPROATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3259

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCOR SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPROATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOS SANTOS JASMINE MARIE

Defendant Attorney

KNEAFSEY SEAN MARCO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/21/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN M. KNEAFSEY REGARDING INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH DEMURRER MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT AS TO COMPLAINT

7/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN M. KNEAFSEY REGARDING INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH DEMURRER MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT AS TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION [AND PROPOSED ORDER] TO STAY CASE DUE TO DEFENDANTS CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY

7/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION [AND PROPOSED ORDER] TO STAY CASE DUE TO DEFENDANTS CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/30/2021

7/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/30/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN M. KNEAFSEY REGARDING STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY IN RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER DATED JULY 30, 2021

8/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN M. KNEAFSEY REGARDING STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY IN RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER DATED JULY 30, 2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

1/25/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)

1/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (BANKRUPTCY) NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

7/24/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (BANKRUPTCY) NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Sean M. Kneafsey Regarding Status of Bankruptcy in Response to Court Order Dated July 30, 2021); Filed by GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC., a Delaware Corproation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 3:24 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION [AND PROPOSED ORDER] TO STAY CASE DUE TO DEFENDANT?S CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY); Filed by GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC., a Delaware Corproation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) (NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS); Filed by GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC., a Delaware Corproation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ALCOR SOLUTIONS INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALCOR SOLUTIONS INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ALCOR SOLUTIONS INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALCOR SOLUTIONS INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALCOR SOLUTIONS INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPROATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNEAFSEY SEAN M.