This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 11:27:13 (UTC).

ALCIDES BLADIMIR MENJIVAR PALACIOS, ET AL. VS 8935 BURNETT AVENUE INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 ALCIDES BLADIMIR MENJIVAR PALACIOS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 8935 BURNETT AVENUE INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7433

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MENJIVAR PALACIOS ALCIDES BLADIMIR

PAGUADA DIAZ CINTHIA MARISOL

JEANIE VICTORIA MONTEL A MINOR BY AND THROUGH THEIR GUARDIAN AD LITEM VICTORIA MENJIVAR

MENJIVAR VICTORIA

Defendants

MEHTA ANIL

J.K. PROPERTIES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JOGANI HARESH

8935 BURNETT AVENUE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

J.K RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTELBLANCO ERIC E

Defendant Attorney

LEE CLAYTON TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

4/1/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

4/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/24/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

2/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

2/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

2/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

2/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

2/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 8935 BURNETT AVENUE INC, a California corporation (Defendant); J.K RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC, a California corporation (Defendant); J.K. PROPERTIES, INC a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION); Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jeanie); Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alcides Bladimir Menjivar Palacios (Plaintiff); Victoria Menjivar (Plaintiff); Cinthia Marisol Paguada Diaz (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 8935 BURNETT AVENUE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where J.K. PROPERTIES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTERLBANCO ERIC E ESQ.