This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2022 at 17:42:00 (UTC).

ALCAZAR, RICHARD CRAWFORD VS CRAWFORD, CARLOS ALCAZAR

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 ALCAZAR, RICHARD CRAWFORD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CRAWFORD, CARLOS ALCAZAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DORDI, FIRDAUS F and ELLIS, STEVEN A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7185

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DORDI, FIRDAUS F

ELLIS, STEVEN A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALCAZAR RICHARD CRAWFORD

Respondent

CRAWFORD CARLOS ALCAZAR

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

9/30/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/8/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - in support of attorney's motion to be relieved as counsel-civil

9/8/2021: Declaration - in support of attorney's motion to be relieved as counsel-civil

RFO/MTN - Withdraw/Be Relieved as Counsel of Record

9/8/2021: RFO/MTN - Withdraw/Be Relieved as Counsel of Record

Minute Order

6/13/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

10/11/2022: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices)

9/21/2022: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices)

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

8/26/2022: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Declaration - Default FL170

8/26/2022: Declaration - Default FL170

Notice - Entry of Judgment

8/26/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Judgment

8/26/2022: Judgment

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

8/26/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Judgment Checklist

8/26/2022: Judgment Checklist

Minute Order

8/17/2022: Minute Order

Reply

10/20/2021: Reply

Agreement - Marital Settlement - Settlement Agreement

6/13/2022: Agreement - Marital Settlement - Settlement Agreement

Minute Order

7/7/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

6/13/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketJudgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketJudgment Checklist; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2C, Ellis, Steven A., Presiding; RFOMOD - Spousal Support - Off Calendar - Per Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less