This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2020 at 18:16:17 (UTC).

ALBERTO MACHADO VS NAAMAN SCOTT MARSHALL

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 ALBERTO MACHADO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NAAMAN SCOTT MARSHALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1212

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACHADO ALBERTO

Defendant

MARSHALL NAAMAN SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSENTHAL NEAL R. LAW OFFICES OF

DESANTIS DANIEL SHELDON

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY J. LUCETT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

12/9/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 12/09/2019

12/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 12/09/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Notice of Ruling

10/28/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL DIS...)

10/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL DIS...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL DISCOVERY AND MOTION CUT OFF DATES BASED UPON NEW TRIAL DATE

10/22/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL DISCOVERY AND MOTION CUT OFF DATES BASED UPON NEW TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling re Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial

11/21/2018: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling re Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial

Order - Order Re: Motion to Continue Trial; Motion Granted

11/20/2018: Order - Order Re: Motion to Continue Trial; Motion Granted

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)

11/20/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

10/17/2018: Motion to Continue Trial Date

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ALBERTO MACHADO'S MOTION

4/25/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ALBERTO MACHADO'S MOTION

DECLARATION OF NEAL R. ROSENTHAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS;AND ETC.

4/25/2018: DECLARATION OF NEAL R. ROSENTHAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS;AND ETC.

SEPARATE DISCOVERY STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ALBERTO MACHADO'S MOTION TO COMPEL

4/25/2018: SEPARATE DISCOVERY STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ALBERTO MACHADO'S MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF ALBERTO MACHADO

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF ALBERTO MACHADO

Minute Order -

5/22/2018: Minute Order -

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALBERTO MACHADO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docketat 4:45 PM in Department 4B; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 12/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by ALBERTO MACHADO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by NAAMAN SCOTT MARSHALL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and all discovery and motion cut-off dates based upon the new trial date) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and all Discovery and Motion Cut Off Dates based upon New Trial Date; Filed by NAAMAN SCOTT MARSHALL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by ALBERTO MACHADO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALBERTO MACHADO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL NEAL R. LAW OFFICES OF

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DESANTIS, DANIEL S.