This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 19:20:11 (UTC).

ALBERTO JUARBE VS JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 ALBERTO JUARBE filed an Other lawsuit against JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0545

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Cross Defendants

JUARBE ALBERTO

NUTRI-BURN LLC

Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA LTD.

NUTRI-BURN LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Cross Defendant Attorney

KURTZ GARY

Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

QUEALLY CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/19/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Ruling

1/13/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

1/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 11/19/2020

11/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 11/19/2020

Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD.'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF ALBERTO JUARBE TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD.

11/4/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD.'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF ALBERTO JUARBE TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO CROSS-COMPL...)

11/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO CROSS-COMPL...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO HAVE ALL DEMURRERS RELATING TO THE ARBITRATION AWARD HEARD AT A SINGLE HEARING AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

9/25/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO HAVE ALL DEMURRERS RELATING TO THE ARBITRATION AWARD HEARD AT A SINGLE HEARING AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF HIS PETITION AND HIS CROSS-COMPLAIN AND IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/4/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF HIS PETITION AND HIS CROSS-COMPLAIN AND IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

9/1/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/14/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/14/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

8/18/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/18/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/6/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION

8/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION]

2/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION]

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees); Filed by Alberto Juarbe (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, Ltd. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Christopher B. Queally in support of Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Interest of Respondent and Cross-Petitioner Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, Ltd. as Prevailing Party Against Petitioner and Cross-Respondent Alberto Juarbe); Filed by Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, Ltd. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Filed by Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, Ltd. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award;) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing - Other on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, Ltd. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Hearing on Petition]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPetition (Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award Against Alberto Juarbe and to Establish Sole Liability of Nutri-Burn, LLC.); Filed by Alberto Juarbe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Alberto Juarbe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alberto Juarbe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1970
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Hearing - Other (on Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award;)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA LTD. is a litigant