This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 14:01:33 (UTC).

ALBERTO GALAN VS MARQUS PEELER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 ALBERTO GALAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARQUS PEELER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KERRY BENSINGER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1833

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KERRY BENSINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALAN ALBERTO

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Defendants

FOJAS CHANEL K.

PEELER MARQUS

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NESS PAUL LELAND NESS

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FITZPATRICK PETER VINCENT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/20/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Lien

6/7/2022: Notice of Lien

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 02/24/2023

2/24/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 02/24/2023

Order - Dismissal

2/24/2023: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

2/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alberto Galan on 08/27/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 581(b)(3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Peter Vincent FitzPatrick (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Bradford & Barthel, LLP to LAW OFFICES OF Bradford & Barthel, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by: INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST (Plaintiff); Insurance Company of the West (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alberto Galan (Plaintiff); As to: Marqus Peeler (Defendant); Chanel K. Fojas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alberto Galan (Plaintiff); As to: Marqus Peeler (Defendant); Chanel K. Fojas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alberto Galan (Plaintiff); As to: Marqus Peeler (Defendant); Chanel K. Fojas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less