This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 16:16:14 (UTC).

ALBERTO CORTEZ VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 ALBERTO CORTEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9604

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTEZ ALBERTO

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMITH DAVID

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS STACEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

10/12/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Order

12/10/2021: Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

11/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/9/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • Hearing06/30/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS STACEY