This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:42:59 (UTC).

ALBERT SANCHEZ VS NATHANS EASY HAUL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/27/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by ALBERT SANCHEZ against NATHANS EASY HAUL INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4102

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SANCHEZ ALBERT

Claimant

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1-20

HERRERA RENE

NATHAN'S EASY HAUL INC.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIEN PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTIONS 3850-3865; ETC

6/22/2018: NOTICE OF LIEN PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTIONS 3850-3865; ETC

LIEN CLAIMANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

8/30/2018: LIEN CLAIMANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

Notice of Lien

4/11/2019: Notice of Lien

SUMMONS

4/27/2018: SUMMONS

C0MPLMNT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE

4/27/2018: C0MPLMNT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • Notice of Lien; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • LIEN CLAIMANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Notice of Lien; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF LIEN PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTIONS 3850-3865; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Albert Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • C0MPLMNT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704102    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: 29

Sanchez v. Nathans Easy Haul Inc. et al.

Good cause having been shown, the court GRANTS the Motion to Continue Trial and Related Discovery Cut-Off Dates filed by Intervenor Scottsdale Insurance Company.  The trial is continued to September 15, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.  The final status conference is continued to September 1, 2020.

The trial date is firm.  The parties are ordered to inform their witness of the new trial date immediately.  No further continuances should be expected. 

Moving party is ordered to give notice.