This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2022 at 03:10:01 (UTC).

ALBERT MARTINEZ VS PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 ALBERT MARTINEZ filed an Other lawsuit against PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0832

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ ALBERT

Defendant

PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAMBARDELLA STEVEN CARMINE

Defendant Attorney

WHITEHEAD JONQUIL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/8/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/8/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2024
  • Hearing10/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • Hearing12/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • Hearing12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Albert Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Albert Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Albert Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Albert Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Albert Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant