This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 16:44:44 (UTC).

ALBERT GRIGORYAN VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 ALBERT GRIGORYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0223

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIGORYAN ALBERT

Defendants

JAGUAR LAND ROVER CERRITOS INC.

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHEVONDYAN ARSHAVIR ARIK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/17/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/16/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

5/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/24/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 06/14/2022

6/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 06/14/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

6/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

6/13/2022: Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docketat 3:56 PM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 06/14/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Albert Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Albert Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Albert Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Albert Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Albert Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Albert Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAGUAR LAND ROVER CERRITOS A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN; is a litigant

Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHEVONDYAN ARSHAVIR ARIK