This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 20:03:57 (UTC).

ALBERT BEVINS VS ANHEUSER BUSCH INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 ALBERT BEVINS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ANHEUSER BUSCH INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8253

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEVINS ALBERT

Defendants

ANHEUSER BUSCH INC.

ANHEUSER-BUSCH COMPANIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALTAXE MICHAEL F

Defendant Attorney

PAK ANGELA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/3/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/3/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

6/3/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 06/13/2022

6/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 06/13/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/7/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Answer

7/5/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF COURTS ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE

7/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURTS ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

7/15/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC Erroneously Sued As Anheuser Busch Inc. (Defendant); Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC Erroneously Sued As Anheuser Busch Inc. (Defendant); Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF COURTS ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE); Filed by Albert Bevins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Albert Bevins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Albert Bevins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 2:21 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory challenge to judicial officer;) of 06/13/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory challenge to judicial officer;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Albert Bevins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Albert Bevins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Albert Bevins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Albert Bevins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANHEUSER BUSCH COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALTAXE MICHAEL F