This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 09:10:15 (UTC).

ALBA GLORIA ZAVALA QUINTEROS VS NEXT LEVEL STAFFING 30 INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 ALBA GLORIA ZAVALA QUINTEROS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NEXT LEVEL STAFFING 30 INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9779

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAVALA QUINTEROS ALBA GLORIA

Defendants

NEXT LEVEL STAFFING 30 INC.

PIXIOR LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

Defendant Attorneys

FARIVAR FAHIM

ROSS PETER W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/13/2022: Complaint

Association of Attorney

5/17/2023: Association of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF RESPONSE...)

2/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF RESPONSE...)

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/3/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; PROPOSED ORDER

1/31/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; PROPOSED ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF RESPONSE...)

1/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF RESPONSE...)

Substitution of Attorney

1/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

12/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

12/16/2022: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

Case Management Order

12/16/2022: Case Management Order

Initial Status Conference Report

12/9/2022: Initial Status Conference Report

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT PIXIOR, LLC

12/8/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT PIXIOR, LLC

Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/7/2022: Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/30/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Initial Status Conference Order

9/30/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

9/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketAddress for Peter W. Ross (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Pixior LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Response to Complaint scheduled for 02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 updated: Result Date to 02/08/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Response...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by: Pixior LLC (Defendant); As to: Alba Gloria Zavala Quinteros (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Response to Complaint scheduled for 02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Response...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketStipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint; Proposed Order; Signed and Filed by: Alba Gloria Zavala Quinteros (Plaintiff); As to: Pixior LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Response to Complaint scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/08/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alba Gloria Zavala Quinteros (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alba Gloria Zavala Quinteros (Plaintiff); As to: Next Level Staffing 30 Inc. (Defendant); Pixior LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alba Gloria Zavala Quinteros (Plaintiff); As to: Next Level Staffing 30 Inc. (Defendant); Pixior LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos in Department 9 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less