This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 07:00:04 (UTC).

ALBA GLORIA ZAVALA QUINTEROS VS NEXT LEVEL STAFFING 30 INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 ALBA GLORIA ZAVALA QUINTEROS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NEXT LEVEL STAFFING 30 INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9779

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAVALA QUINTEROS ALBA GLORIA

Defendants

NEXT LEVEL STAFFING 30 INC.

PIXIOR LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

Defendant Attorney

KNIGHT STACEY MCKEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/13/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

12/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

12/16/2022: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

Case Management Order

12/16/2022: Case Management Order

Initial Status Conference Report

12/9/2022: Initial Status Conference Report

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT PIXIOR, LLC

12/8/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT PIXIOR, LLC

Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/7/2022: Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/30/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Initial Status Conference Order

9/30/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

9/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/13/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/13/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Electronic Service- Case Anywhere; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Response to Complaint scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 updated: Result Date to 12/16/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Report; Filed by: Alba Gloria Zavala Quinteros (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance Of Defendant Pixior, LLC; Filed by: Pixior LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alba Gloria Zavala Quinteros (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alba Gloria Zavala Quinteros (Plaintiff); As to: Next Level Staffing 30 Inc. (Defendant); Pixior LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alba Gloria Zavala Quinteros (Plaintiff); As to: Next Level Staffing 30 Inc. (Defendant); Pixior LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos in Department 9 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEXT LEVEL STAFFING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PIXIOR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NALBANDYAN A. JACOB