Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 20:37:01 (UTC).

ALAYAH RICKY MUNOZ, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES VS MAGGIE?S PUB, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 ALAYAH RICKY MUNOZ, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MAGGIE S PUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9554

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNOZ ALAYAH RICKY A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES

Defendants

MAGGIE?S PUB

VARELA ANTHONY EDWARD

MAGGIE?S ENTERPRISES INC.

MANGUBAT KYLE MICHAEL

ESCANDON OSCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REGULY BREANNE J

VAZIRI SIAMAK

MUNRO ELIZABETH C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALAYAH

4/29/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALAYAH

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

3/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

4/6/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALAYAH

4/6/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALAYAH

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/1/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALAYAH

1/4/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALAYAH

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/29/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Alayah Ricky Munoz, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alayah Ricky Munoz, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Alayah); Filed by Alayah Ricky Munoz, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Alayah); Filed by Alayah Ricky Munoz, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Association of Counsel); Filed by Alayah Ricky Munoz, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Alayah); Filed by Alayah Ricky Munoz, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alayah Ricky Munoz, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alayah Ricky Munoz, A MINOR THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ALISSA FLORES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGULY BREANNE J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUNRO ELIZABETH C.