This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 17:47:23 (UTC).

ALAS, ANTONIA AKA LOPEZ, ANTONIA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 ALAS, ANTONIA AKA LOPEZ, ANTONIA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8441

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEJIA RICHARD

Decedent

ALAS ANTONIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RODRIGUEZ RENAY GRACE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

8/30/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Proof of Publication

9/13/2021: Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

9/10/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Minute Order

11/4/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Ruling

10/19/2021: Notice - Ruling

Minute Order

10/15/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/7/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2023
  • Hearing10/04/2023 at 1:30 PM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2023
  • Hearing10/03/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2023
  • Hearing09/28/2023 at 1:30 PM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • Hearing09/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Probate Department MSC 250A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Ruling; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ RENAY GRACE