This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2023 at 05:39:31 (UTC).

ALARCON ARIPEZ, ALONDRA VS ALARCON DIAZ, JUAN RUBEN

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 ALARCON ARIPEZ, ALONDRA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ALARCON DIAZ, JUAN RUBEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STREIMER, LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2037

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STREIMER, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALARCON ARIPEZ ALONDRA

Respondent

ALARCON DIAZ JUAN RUBEN

Guardian Ad Litem

ARIPEZ ZAMORA MIRIAM MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMAS KENDRA

Respondent Attorney

FELIX EDNA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/25/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/25/2023: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/25/2023: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Order - Appointment and Payment of FCS Specialist

12/29/2022: Order - Appointment and Payment of FCS Specialist

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/29/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

12/29/2022: Minute Order

Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications - Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declarations)

12/14/2022: Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications - Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declarations)

Minute Order

12/8/2022: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

12/8/2022: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

12/8/2022: Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

Proof of Service

12/8/2022: Proof of Service

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/8/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

10/27/2022: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Response - Domestic Violence

12/5/2022: Response - Domestic Violence

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

12/5/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

11/17/2022: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/17/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

11/17/2022: Minute Order

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department D at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Restraining Order Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department D, Streimer, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department D, Streimer, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointment and Payment of FCS Specialist

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Guardian Ad Litem

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketApplication for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less