This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 10:37:33 (UTC).

ALAN W. KAPILOW VS STEPHAN KLEIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 ALAN W KAPILOW filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEPHAN KLEIN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2509

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

A & S REALTY GROUP LLC

KAPILOW ALAN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

KLEIN STEPHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUNDERMAN GUS H.

CONNETTE MICHAEL T.

 

Court Documents

Witness List

1/7/2022: Witness List

Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST EVFDENTIARY HEARING PLAINTIFFS'UPPLEMENTARY EXHIBIT LIST (EXHIBIT R)

1/7/2022: Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST EVFDENTIARY HEARING PLAINTIFFS'UPPLEMENTARY EXHIBIT LIST (EXHIBIT R)

Exhibit List

1/7/2022: Exhibit List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

1/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

Summary of the Case

2/9/2022: Summary of the Case

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GUS H. GUNDERMAN

2/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GUS H. GUNDERMAN

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND/OR DEFAULT PROVE-UP) OF 03/18/2022

3/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND/OR DEFAULT PROVE-UP) OF 03/18/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND/OR DEFAULT PROVE-UP)

3/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND/OR DEFAULT PROVE-UP)

Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED

3/18/2022: Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

4/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/22/2021

12/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/22/2021

Answer

3/5/2021: Answer

Exhibit List

12/1/2021: Exhibit List

Trial Brief

12/1/2021: Trial Brief

Witness List

12/1/2021: Witness List

Statement of the Case

12/1/2021: Statement of the Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLA...)

12/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLA...)

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Alan Kapilow (Plaintiff); A & S Realty Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Stephan Klein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Status Date changed from 03/18/2022 to 03/18/2022; Name Extension: blank; Result Date changed from 03/18/2022 to 03/18/2022; As To Parties changed from Stephan Klein (Defendant) to Stephan Klein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Alan Kapilow and Plaintiff A & S Realty Group, LLC, a California limited liability company against Defendant Stephan Klein on the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Alan Kapilow, et al. on 09/16/2019 for costs of $2,165.66 for a total of $2,165.66.Other: 1. The sole owner and member of Plaintiff A & S Realty Group LLC (A&S) is Kapilow and Klein shall have no legal or equitable membership interest of any kind in A&S. 2. As between A&S and Klein, A&S is the sole legal and equitable owner of the following parcels of real property located in the County of Los Angeles commonly known by the following addresses and designated by the following assessor parcel numbers by the County of Los Angeles: A. 1742 W. 80th St. Los Angeles 90047 (APN 6034-008-006) B. 921 W. 82d St. Los Angeles 90044(APN 6032-005-027) C. 249-255 E. 83d St./8267-8267 San Pedro 90003 (APN 6030-010-034) D. 1312 W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment and/or Default Prove-up)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment and/or Default Prove-up) of 03/18/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Pursuant to the Request for Dismissal filed by A & S Realty Group, LLC, Alan Kapilow on 07/27/2020, Doe(s) As to Doe and Roe Defendants only in Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Alan Kapilow, et al. on 09/16/2019 is dismissed without prejudice. Other Details: La Does Comment changed from As to Doe Defendants only to As to Doe and Roe Defendants onlyRecovery Comments:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment and/or Default Prove-up scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 updated: Result Date to 03/18/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketJudgment Proposed; Signed and Filed by: Alan Kapilow (Plaintiff); A & S Realty Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Stephan Klein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed: Filed By: A & S Realty Group, LLC (Plaintiff),Alan Kapilow (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by: Alan Kapilow (Plaintiff); A & S Realty Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, ALAN W. KAPILOW, FOR APPOI...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application for appointment of receiver scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 85 updated: Result Date to 06/28/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alan W. Kapilow (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ruth Ann Kwan in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application appointing a receiver; Filed by: Alan W. Kapilow (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Pace in support of ex parte; Filed by: Alan W. Kapilow (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Kapilow in support of ex parte; Filed by: Alan W. Kapilow (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application for appointment of receiver scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 85

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******2509 Hearing Date: October 7, 2021 Dept: 72

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Date: 10/7/21 (8:30 AM)

Case: Alan W. Kapilow v. Stephan Klein et al. (*******2509)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Counsel Shawn Olson, Esq.’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for defendant Stephan Klein is GRANTED, subject to counsel submitting a new Proposed Order with the following revisions: (1) Item 6 shall include defendant Stephan Klein’s current or last known address and telephone number; and (2) Item 9(b) shall reflect the correct start time of trial as 10:00 a.m.

Counsel will be relieved effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the signed order upon the client.

'


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A & S REALTY GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUNDERMAN GUS H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONNETTE MICHAEL T.