This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2022 at 06:33:57 (UTC).

ALAN STEWART CARON VS CITY OF PASADENA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 ALAN STEWART CARON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF PASADENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4250

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARON ALAN STEWART

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

CITY OF PASADENA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANGASSARIAN MEGAN

Defendant Attorneys

HURRELL THOMAS CHARLES

LEE ARNOLD F

PELCH MANAL H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

1/21/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/21/2022: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

1/14/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Answer

1/6/2022: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2024
  • Hearing12/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • Hearing05/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by City of Pasadena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Pasadena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant County of Los Angeles without Prejudice and [Proposed] Order); Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alan Stewart Caron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alan Stewart Caron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alan Stewart Caron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alan Stewart Caron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alan Stewart Caron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alan Stewart Caron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF PASADENA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE ARNOLD F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURRELL, THOMAS C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELCH MANAL H.