Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2021 at 23:57:34 (UTC).

ALAN B PICK VS XIA ZHANG

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 ALAN B PICK filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against XIA ZHANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4660

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PICK ALAN B

Defendant

ZHANG XIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD

Defendant Attorney

ASH PAUL

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

4/7/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/7/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/19/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • Hearing07/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Xia Zhang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Xia Zhang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Xia Zhang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Alan B Pick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Alan B Pick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alan B Pick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alan B Pick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD