Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 03:48:18 (UTC).

ALAMEDA COURT LLC ET AL VS DAVID ROBINSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 ALAMEDA COURT LLC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against DAVID ROBINSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM and MICHAEL JOHNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5605

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ALAMEDA COURT LLC

FORTE RESOURCES INC.

LIN CHUANG-I

Defendants and Respondents

ROBINSION DAVID

LAW OFFICES OF VICTOR JACOBOVITZ APC

KENNINGER SHIRLEY

DOES 1 - 50

KENNINGER & ASSOCIATES

JACOBOVITZ VICTOR

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BOLLIN KURT S. ESQ.

KURT S. BOLLIN LAW OFFICE OF

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH JAY

KENNINGER SHIRLEY ANN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/26/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF VICTOR JACOBOVITZ REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENTS OF CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 439(A)

6/21/2018: DECLARATION OF VICTOR JACOBOVITZ REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENTS OF CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 439(A)

REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICJAL NOTICE; DECLARATION OF SHIRLEY KENNINGER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/29/2018: REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICJAL NOTICE; DECLARATION OF SHIRLEY KENNINGER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

8/31/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

DEFENDANTS' SHIRLEY KENNINOER'S AND DAVID ROBINSON? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL PROCEDURE CODE SECTIONS 435 AND 436; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHO

9/24/2018: DEFENDANTS' SHIRLEY KENNINOER'S AND DAVID ROBINSON? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL PROCEDURE CODE SECTIONS 435 AND 436; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHO

ORDER RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

10/2/2018: ORDER RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order

10/16/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

10/16/2018: Ex Parte Application

Association of Attorney

2/19/2019: Association of Attorney

Motion for Summary Adjudication

3/22/2019: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Motion for Summary Adjudication

3/22/2019: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Request for Judicial Notice

3/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

3/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

NOTICE RE:CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

11/1/2017: NOTICE RE:CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CHECK ALERT

10/18/2017: CHECK ALERT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/4/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

9/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion To Discover Financial Documents) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Alameda Court, LLC (Plaintiff); Forte Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff); Chuang-I Lin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion To Discover Financial Documents) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTIO...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by David Robinsion (Defendant); Shirley Kenninger (Defendant); Kenninger & Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Opposition (Ex Parte Application of April 5 2019); Filed by Alameda Court, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by David Robinsion (Defendant); Shirley Kenninger (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Alameda Court, LLC (Plaintiff); Forte Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff); Chuang-I Lin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Alameda Court, LLC (Plaintiff); Forte Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff); Chuang-I Lin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Alameda Court, LLC (Plaintiff); Forte Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff); Chuang-I Lin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COMPLAINT 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOLLIN KURT STEPHAN