This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2019 at 20:55:51 (UTC).

ALAIN R'BIBO VS. SARKIS SAM KHLGATIAN

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 ALAIN R'BIBO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SARKIS SAM KHLGATIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6700

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R'BIBO ALAIN

Defendant

KHLGATIAN SARKIS SAM

Assignee

MOUNTAIN RECOVERY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIDOVICH KAUFMAN LEGAL GROUP APA

 

Court Documents

Affidavit

1/9/2019: Affidavit

Unknown

11/20/2018: Unknown

Affidavit

10/25/2018: Affidavit

Unknown

1/24/2019: Unknown

Writ of Execution

1/24/2019: Writ of Execution

Application and Order Regarding Lost Writ

1/16/2019: Application and Order Regarding Lost Writ

Assignment of Judgment

3/14/2019: Assignment of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order Regarding Lost Writ; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Interest); Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketAffidavit (Of Interest Computations in Support of Writ of Execution); Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-07-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Alain R'Bibo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6700    Hearing Date: March 06, 2020    Dept: A

R’Bibo v Khlgation

Motion for Assignment Order

Calendar:

16

Case No.:

****6700

Hearing Date:

March 06, 2020

Action Filed:

April 28, 2017

Judgment:

February 28, 2018

MP:

Assignee of Record Mountain Recovery, LLC

RP:

N/A

ALLEGATIONS:

The action arose out of Defendant Sarkis Sam Khlgatian (“Defendant”) to remit lease payments on rental property located at 6061 Shadyglade Avenue, North Hollywood, CA 91606 (the “Property”) to the owner of the Property, Plaintiff Alain R’Bibo (“Plaintiff”).

Plaintiff filed his Complaint on April 28, 2017, alleging three causes of action sounding in (1) Breach of Guarantee, (2) Common Count – Quantum Meruit/Unjust Enrichment, and (3) Common Count – Account Stated.

Following service, the Court entered a Default Judgment against Defendant in the amount of $19,380.00 on February 28, 2018. The judgment was thereafter assigned to Assignee of Record Mountain Recovery, LLC (“Assignee”) on March 13, 2019, and filed with the Court on March 14, 2019.

PRESENTATION:

The instant motion for assignment order was filed by Assignee on December 11, 2019. No opposition or reply has been received.

RELIEF REQUESTED:

Assignee moves for an order assigning commissions or residuals earned through Defendant’s occupation as a licensed insurance adjustor under his California Department of Insurance License No. 0C28841.

DISCUSSION:

Lack of Service – The Court cannot identify any proof of service for the instant motion, and notes that one of the exhibits to the motion appears to provide a business address for Defendant’s place of business. Without proof of service, the Court cannot grant the instant order. Code of Civ. Proc. ;708.510(b).

---

RULING: Deny

In the event the parties submit on this tentative ruling, or a party requests a signed order or the court in its discretion elects to sign a formal order, the following form will be either electronically signed or signed in hard copy and entered into the court’s records.

ORDER

Assignee of Record Mountain Recovery, LLC’s Motion for Assignment Order came on regularly for hearing on March 06, 2020, with appearances/submissions as noted in the minute order for said hearing, and the court, being fully advised in the premises, did then and there rule as follows:

THE MOTION IS DENIED.

DATE: _______________ _______________________________

JUDGE



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNTAIN RECOVERY LLC is a litigant