This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2021 at 02:26:35 (UTC).

AL HASSAS, ET AL. VS WORLD OF DANCE TOUR, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 AL HASSAS filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against WORLD OF DANCE TOUR, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, DAVID J. COWAN, TERRY GREEN and BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2378

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

DAVID J. COWAN

TERRY GREEN

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SWEET LEMONS LLC

HASSAS AL

Respondent

WORLD OF DANCE TOUR INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JONELIS ESQ DAVID B

Respondent Attorney

KAHANA AMIR MOSHE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE

8/16/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANE HONG-ELSEY CSR#11975

3/12/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANE HONG-ELSEY CSR#11975

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; HEARING O...) OF 03/12/2021

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; HEARING O...) OF 03/12/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; HEARING O...)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; HEARING O...)

Other - - COURT ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD HEARING HELD 3/12/21

3/12/2021: Other - - COURT ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD HEARING HELD 3/12/21

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/17/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Brief - BRIEF PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE JURISDICTION

3/1/2021: Brief - BRIEF PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE JURISDICTION

Reply - REPLY RESPONDENT WORLD OF DANCE TOUR, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

2/22/2021: Reply - REPLY RESPONDENT WORLD OF DANCE TOUR, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Request for Judicial Notice

2/22/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Other - - AMENDED COURT ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION HEARING HELD 2/5/21

2/10/2021: Other - - AMENDED COURT ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION HEARING HELD 2/5/21

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANE HONG-ELSEY CSR#11975

2/5/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANE HONG-ELSEY CSR#11975

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER; HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFI...) OF 02/05/2021

2/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER; HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFI...) OF 02/05/2021

Order - COURT ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION HEARING HELD 2/5/21

2/5/2021: Order - COURT ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION HEARING HELD 2/5/21

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER; HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFI...)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER; HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/10/2021

2/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/10/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF LIFTING OF AUTOMATIC STAY IN CONNECTION WITH UPCOMING HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

1/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF LIFTING OF AUTOMATIC STAY IN CONNECTION WITH UPCOMING HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • Hearing11/05/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Petition (to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue Hearing Date); Filed by WORLD OF DANCE TOUR, INC. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Petition (to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Petition (to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Transfer (CSR# 158217908929) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:58 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by WORLD OF DANCE TOUR, INC. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Al Hassas (Petitioner); SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Al Hassas (Petitioner); SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Al Hassas (Petitioner); SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Al Hassas (Petitioner); SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWEET LEMONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WORLD OF DANCE TOUR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHANA AMIR MOSHE