This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 01:59:39 (UTC).

AKRAM ABDOU, AN INDIVIDUAL, VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 AKRAM ABDOU, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7887

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABDOU AN INDIVIDUAL AKRAM

Defendants

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALES TIMOTHY

Defendant Attorney

LAUBER NICHOLAS DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/11/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/20/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/17/2020: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/18/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

2/5/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Hearing05/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Hearing04/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order ([PROPOSED] - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Akram Abdou, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Akram Abdou, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Akram Abdou, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Akram Abdou, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less