This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 10:54:42 (UTC).

AKM HOLDINGS LLC VS HUBHAUS, INC

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 AKM HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against HUBHAUS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1114

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AKM HOLDINGS LLC

Defendant

HUBHAUS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/31/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (HUBHAUS, INC)

8/31/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (HUBHAUS, INC)

Notice of Status Conference and Order

8/30/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((HUBHAUS, INC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AKM HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by AKM HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AKM HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AKM HOLDINGS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUBHAUS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A