Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2020 at 20:32:30 (UTC).

AKBAR OMAR VS MARIAM MOUSSA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 AKBAR OMAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARIAM MOUSSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OMAR AKBAR

Defendants

RAKOTY ASSOCIATE ARCHITECTS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOUSSA MARIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OMAR SHAZAD

Defendant Attorneys

BERGER MICHELLE

MURTAUGH DEVIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)]

7/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)]

Case Management Statement

7/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Substitution of Attorney

7/21/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

7/21/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

6/25/2020: Answer

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST

5/1/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration re: Due Diligence

3/11/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/4/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/15/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET ADDENDUM

1/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET ADDENDUM

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/14/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • Hearing07/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Hearing07/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Mariam Moussa (Defendant); Rakoty Associate Architects, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Akbar Omar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Case Management Conference)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rakoty Associate Architects, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mariam Moussa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFailure to File Proof of Service) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Mariam Moussa (Defendant); Rakoty Associate Architects, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Akbar Omar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (Civil Case Coversheet Addendum); Filed by Akbar Omar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Akbar Omar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Akbar Omar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERGER MICHELLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURTAUGH DEVIN