This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 04:32:44 (UTC).

AKATERINI LUCY TELLES VS ARMANDO VLADIMIR MORALES

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 AKATERINI LUCY TELLES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARMANDO VLADIMIR MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK M. TAVELMAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0859

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK M. TAVELMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TELLES AKATERINI LUCY

Defendant

MORALES ARMANDO VLADIMIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARDANYAN RUBEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/27/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/28/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

12/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Request for Dismissal

1/10/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Akaterini Lucy Telles on 10/27/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Akaterini Lucy Telles as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Akaterini Lucy Telles (Plaintiff); As to: Armando Vladimir Morales (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/21/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Akaterini Lucy Telles (Plaintiff); As to: Armando Vladimir Morales (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Akaterini Lucy Telles (Plaintiff); As to: Armando Vladimir Morales (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Akaterini Lucy Telles (Plaintiff); As to: Armando Vladimir Morales (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARDANYAN RUBEN