This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 21:53:56 (UTC).

AJANI MY'KEL ZYON GRAHAM, A MINOR BY HIS NATURAL MOTHER AND DULY APPOINTED GUARDIAN AD LITEM, AJA HATHAWAY, ET AL. VS MARIA DE LA LUZ RAMIREZ, AND INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 AJANI MY'KEL ZYON GRAHAM, A MINOR BY HIS NATURAL MOTHER AND DULY APPOINTED GUARDIAN AD LITEM, AJA HATHAWAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA DE LA LUZ RAMIREZ, AND INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8492

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HATHAWAY AND INDIVIDUAL AJA

AJANI MY'KEL ZYON GRAHAM A MINOR BY HIS NATURAL MOTHER AND DULY APPOINTED GUARDIAN AD LITEM AJA HATHAWAY

Defendants

EXCHANGE LA IS FEARLESS LA AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

RAMIREZ AND INDIVIDUAL MARIA DE LA LUZ

JOHNSON AN INDIVIDUAL JERMEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POCRASS JAMES L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/24/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

PI General Order

6/7/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2024
  • Hearing05/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by AJANI MY'KEL ZYON GRAHAM, a minor by his natural mother and duly appointed guardian ad litem, AJA HATHAWAY (Plaintiff); AJA HATHAWAY, and individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AJANI MY'KEL ZYON GRAHAM, a minor by his natural mother and duly appointed guardian ad litem, AJA HATHAWAY (Plaintiff); AJA HATHAWAY, and individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AJANI MY'KEL ZYON GRAHAM, a minor by his natural mother and duly appointed guardian ad litem, AJA HATHAWAY (Plaintiff); AJA HATHAWAY, and individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POCRASS JAMES L.