This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 11:28:28 (UTC).

AIR TIGER EXPRESS (USA), INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION VS CHAO-TEN "STEPHEN" HUANG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 AIR TIGER EXPRESS USA , INC , A NEW YORK CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHAO-TEN STEPHEN HUANG,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0217

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIR TIGER EXPRESS USA INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Defendants

HUANG CHAO-TEN "STEPHEN"

STRAIGHT FORWARDING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WU ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PURDY ANDREW M.

RICKEMAN THOMAS C.

Defendant Attorney

GROSS KENNETH I.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/16/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

9/15/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

10/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/25/2022: Answer

Answer - ANSWER OF ERIC WU AND STRAIGHT FORWARDING, INC. TO COMPLAINT

10/25/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF ERIC WU AND STRAIGHT FORWARDING, INC. TO COMPLAINT

Answer

10/25/2022: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/12/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

3/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/7/2023: Case Management Statement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CHAO-TEN "STEPHEN" HUANG (Defendant); ERIC WU (Defendant); STRAIGHT FORWARDING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: AIR TIGER EXPRESS (USA), INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 05/01/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CHAO-TEN "STEPHEN" HUANG (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CHAO-TEN "STEPHEN" HUANG (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer OF ERIC WU AND STRAIGHT FORWARDING, INC. TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: ERIC WU (Defendant); STRAIGHT FORWARDING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kenneth I. Gross (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Of Kenneth I Gross & Associates to Law Ofc Kenneth I Gross & Associates

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AIR TIGER EXPRESS (USA), INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CHAO-TEN "STEPHEN" HUANG (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/28/2022; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Andrew M. Purdy (Attorney): Middle Name changed from Michael to M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AIR TIGER EXPRESS (USA), INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CHAO-TEN "STEPHEN" HUANG (Defendant); ERIC WU (Defendant); STRAIGHT FORWARDING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AIR TIGER EXPRESS (USA), INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CHAO-TEN "STEPHEN" HUANG (Defendant); ERIC WU (Defendant); STRAIGHT FORWARDING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less