This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 03:19:25 (UTC).

AIMEE ZELTZER, ET AL. VS SUZANNE E. GALEN, TRUSTEE AND SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE EUGENE H. GALEN AND SUZANNE E. GALEN FAMILY TRUST OF 1996 AND TRUSTEE

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 AIMEE ZELTZER, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUZANNE E GALEN, TRUSTEE AND SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE EUGENE H GALEN AND SUZANNE E GALEN FAMILY TRUST OF 1996 AND TRUSTEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9918

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANCES HELENE

ZELTZER AIMEE

Defendants

GALEN TRUSTEE AND SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE EUGENE H. GALEN AND SUZANNE E. GALEN FAMILY TRUST OF 1996 AND TRUSTEE OF THE EUGENE H. GALEN EXCEPTION TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT

GALEN TRUSTEE OF THE EUGENE H. GALEN EXCEPTION TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI DANIEL J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/20/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

12/20/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/20/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

3/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

3/21/2023: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

3/21/2023: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

3/21/2023: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • Hearing05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/19/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Service; Filed by: Aimee Zeltzer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Service; Filed by: Aimee Zeltzer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Service; Filed by: Aimee Zeltzer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Aimee Zeltzer (Plaintiff); Helene Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Armen Tamzarian in Department 52 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Aimee Zeltzer (Plaintiff); Helene Frances (Plaintiff); As to: Suzanne E. Galen, Trustee and Successor Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen and Suzanne E. Galen Family Trust of 1996 and Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant); Douglas Galen, Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant); Steven Galen, Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Aimee Zeltzer (Plaintiff); Helene Frances (Plaintiff); As to: Suzanne E. Galen, Trustee and Successor Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen and Suzanne E. Galen Family Trust of 1996 and Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant); Douglas Galen, Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant); Steven Galen, Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Aimee Zeltzer (Plaintiff); Helene Frances (Plaintiff); As to: Suzanne E. Galen, Trustee and Successor Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen and Suzanne E. Galen Family Trust of 1996 and Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant); Douglas Galen, Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant); Steven Galen, Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Aimee Zeltzer (Plaintiff); Helene Frances (Plaintiff); As to: Suzanne E. Galen, Trustee and Successor Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen and Suzanne E. Galen Family Trust of 1996 and Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant); Douglas Galen, Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant); Steven Galen, Trustee of the Eugene H. Galen Exception Trust Under Agreement dated 4-17-1995 and Eugene H. Galen Marital Trust Under Agreement dated 4-27-1996 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less