Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 10:50:11 (UTC).

AIMEE HUI CHEN, ET AL. VS ANTHONY OLMEDO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 AIMEE HUI CHEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANTHONY OLMEDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0080

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHEN CHRISTOPHER

CHEN AIMEE HUI

Defendants

OLMEDO ANTHONY

HOME TREND DEVELOPERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLATER BLAKE

 

Court Documents

General Denial

4/2/2021: General Denial

General Denial

4/2/2021: General Denial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/28/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/28/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Hearing06/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Aimee Hui Chen (Plaintiff); Christopher Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aimee Hui Chen (Plaintiff); Christopher Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aimee Hui Chen (Plaintiff); Christopher Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aimee Hui Chen (Plaintiff); Christopher Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLATER BLAKE S.