This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 15:35:51 (UTC).

AIDE C. ONTIVEROS VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 AIDE C ONTIVEROS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3239

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONTIVEROS AIDE C.

Defendants

COCA COLA COMPANY

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ONTIVEROS AIDE CRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2024
  • Hearing11/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • Hearing05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • Hearing05/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aide C. Ontiveros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aide C. Ontiveros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aide C. Ontiveros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases where THE COCA-COLA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ONTIVEROS AIDE C. ESQ.