This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 16:48:12 (UTC).

AHMED SEEDAT VS STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 AHMED SEEDAT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7200

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEEDAT AHMED

Defendants

PAULI SHAWN P.

STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

4/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/07/2022

4/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/07/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

4/6/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF RULING RE STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION); Filed by Ahmed Seedat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Docketat 3:53 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/07/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION); Filed by Ahmed Seedat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ahmed Seedat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ahmed Seedat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ahmed Seedat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ahmed Seedat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ahmed Seedat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES APC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R