This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2020 at 06:20:20 (UTC).

AHMED AZAB VS 7440 N SEPULVEDA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 AHMED AZAB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 7440 N SEPULVEDA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9157

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AZAB AHMED

Defendants and Respondents

BARAKATALLAH MANAGEMENT

7440 N. SEPULVEDA LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM

FIRM WILSHIRE LAW

SAADIAN BABAK BOBBY

Defendant Attorneys

YEE & ASSOCIATES

YEE STEVEN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AT DEPOSITION

9/8/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AT DEPOSITION

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA, LLCS AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT S NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF S NON- OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAI

9/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA, LLCS AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT S NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF S NON- OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAI

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVE...)

9/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVE...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PLAINTIFF AHMED AZAB AND DEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA, LLC'S AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT'S STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION

7/14/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PLAINTIFF AHMED AZAB AND DEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA, LLC'S AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT'S STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION AND ORDER PLAINTIFF AHMED AZAB AND DEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA, LLC'S AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT'S STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE H

7/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION AND ORDER PLAINTIFF AHMED AZAB AND DEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA, LLC'S AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT'S STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE H

Separate Statement

6/2/2020: Separate Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) OF 04/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

2/7/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

2/7/2020: Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Notice of Ruling

1/24/2020: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL,

1/24/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL,

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/1/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Case Management Statement

10/29/2018: Case Management Statement

PROOF OF SERVICE ? SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

7/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE ? SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA LLC AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/6/2018: DEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA LLC AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE ETC.....

6/8/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE ETC.....

SUMMONS -

6/8/2018: SUMMONS -

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • Hearing06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Hearing03/02/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Hearing03/02/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Defendants 7440 N. Sepulveda, Llc's And Barakat-Allah Management's Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Provide Further Answers To Deposition Questions;) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Defendants 7440 N. Sepulveda, Llc's And Barakat-Allah Management's Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Provide Further Answers To Deposition Questions;) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discove...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by 7440 N. Sepulveda, LLC (Defendant); Barakatallah Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (Defendants 7440 N. Sepulveda, LLC's and Barakat-Allah Management's Notice of Lodgment of a Copy of the Transcript for Plaintiff's Deposition); Filed by 7440 N. Sepulveda, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (DEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA, LLC?S AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT? S NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF ? S NON- OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER DEPOSITION QUESTIONS AND SANCTIONS); Filed by 7440 N. Sepulveda, LLC (Defendant); Barakatallah Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS 7440 N. SEPULVEDA LLC AND BARAKAT-ALLAH MANAGEMENT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 7440 N. Sepulveda, LLC (Defendant); Barakatallah Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ahmed Azab (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ahmed Azab (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ahmed Azab (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE ETC.....

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709157    Hearing Date: September 16, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

AHMED AZAB,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

7440 N SEPULVEDA LLC, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC709157

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL

Dept. 31

10:30 a.m.

September 16, 2020

 

Defendants’ Motion to Compel Further Responses is premature and will be continued to a new date as set forth below. The parties are ordered to participate in an Informal Discovery Conference (“IDC”) as required by the Court’s Standing Order Re: PI Court Procedures (9/26/19), which is available on the LA Superior Court’s website, under the Personal Injury section.

The hearing on the MTFC is continued to _____{{TBD}}_____________ 10:00 a.m. in Department 31 of the Spring Street Courthouse. Moving Party is ordered to use the online reservation management system to schedule an IDC, which must go forward per the terms set forth in the 9/26/19 Standing Order. The Court’s most recent standing general order, at ¶13, makes clear that parties must participate in an IDC before the Court will hear a motion to compel further responses; there is nothing in the order excepting motions to compel further responses at deposition from the order. The IDC must be scheduled at least two weeks prior to the continued hearing date on the MTCF.

If the above date is not convenient for the parties and/or an IDC cannot be scheduled, for whatever reason, within the necessary time period, Moving Party must use the online reservation system to promptly continue the hearing on the motion to a date at least two weeks after the IDC.

Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 16th day of September, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court