This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 05:19:36 (UTC).

AHMAD ZIA VS ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 AHMAD ZIA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8698

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ZIA AHMAD

Defendants and Respondents

GAPPI HERMINIGILDO

DOES 1-25

SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL GROUP USA

ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ELDESSOUKY LAW APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

COLLINS LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/7/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

4/20/2017: SUMMONS

1. DENIAL OF MEAL PERIODS (LAB. CODE SECTIONS 512(A)) & 226.7(B)); 2. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME (LAB. CODE SECTIONS 510 & 1194); ETC

4/20/2017: 1. DENIAL OF MEAL PERIODS (LAB. CODE SECTIONS 512(A)) & 226.7(B)); 2. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME (LAB. CODE SECTIONS 510 & 1194); ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/25/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER OF ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO COMPLAINT

5/18/2017: ANSWER OF ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

6/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

6/15/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/16/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

6/16/2017: Unknown

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/23/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

6/26/2017: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

6/26/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order

7/31/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8/16/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

9/7/2017: Minute Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Cause off-calendar, settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketOrder-Case Management; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default (REJECT FOR SOLUTIONS; GAPPI-#28 PUNITIVE DAMAGES ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketNotice (POST JURY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less