Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2020 at 13:31:23 (UTC).

AHMAD RAZIPOUR VS JUAN ROBLES-TOSCANO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 AHMAD RAZIPOUR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN ROBLES-TOSCANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9376

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAZIPOUR AHMAD

Defendants

DIAMOND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES LP.

ROBLES-TOSCANO JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAPERSTEIN LISA

Defendant Attorney

SIPES EDWARD EUGENE

 

Court Documents

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

6/25/2020: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

Answer

6/25/2020: Answer

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketRequest (Request for Statement of Damages); Filed by Juan Robles-Toscano (Defendant); Diamond Environmental Services, LP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Juan Robles-Toscano (Defendant); Diamond Environmental Services, LP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AHMAD RAZIPOUR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AHMAD RAZIPOUR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AHMAD RAZIPOUR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIAMOND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAPERSTEIN LISA