This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:11:16 (UTC).

AHARON ABRAMOVITCH VS WILSHIRE CREST HOTEL LLC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 AHARON ABRAMOVITCH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILSHIRE CREST HOTEL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1179

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ABRAMOVITCH AHARON

Respondents and Defendants

WILSHIRE CREST HOTEL LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YAGOUBZADEH JONATHAN M.

MOVSESIAN SEVAN IAN

Defendant Attorney

SNYDER LORIN D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

RULING RE: FOUR (4) MOTIONS BY DEFENDANT, WILSHIRE CREST HOTEL, LLC, TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, ETC

12/13/2017: RULING RE: FOUR (4) MOTIONS BY DEFENDANT, WILSHIRE CREST HOTEL, LLC, TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, ETC

Minute Order

12/13/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED M0TION/DISC0VERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

5/29/2018: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED M0TION/DISC0VERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

Minute Order

1/2/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

1/2/2019: Ex Parte Application

Order

1/2/2019: Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/18/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

SUMMONS

2/21/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

2/21/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/21/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE - PREMISES LIABILIT? DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL;

2/21/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE - PREMISES LIABILIT? DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL;

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET ONE; ETC

7/6/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET ONE; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE; ETC

7/6/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE; ETC

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/10/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Other -

7/31/2017: Other -

Answer

7/31/2017: Answer

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Sevan Ian Movsesian (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to continue trial and all related dates); Filed by Aharon Abramovitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketOrder (granting trial continuance); Filed by Aharon Abramovitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application to Continue Trial;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Docket[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED M0TION/DISC0VERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Wilshire Crest Hotel, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Aharon Abramovitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Aharon Abramovitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aharon Abramovitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE - PREMISES LIABILIT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Aharon Abramovitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1179    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: 2

Abramovitch v. Wilshire Crest Hotel, LLC

No tentative ruling will be posted. The Court will hear argument.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER LORIN D.