This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 06:21:12 (UTC).

AHANG ZARIN VS FELDMAN, BERMAN SCHWARTZ, LLP, A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 AHANG ZARIN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against FELDMAN, BERMAN SCHWARTZ, LLP, A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2686

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

ZARIN AHANG AKA AHANG KELK AKA AHANG MIRSHOJAE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FELDMAN BERMAN SCHWARTZ LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

FELDMAN DEBORAH

SCHWARTZ GARY N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BEHJATNIA RUSSELL

ECOFF LAWRENCE C.

Defendant Attorney

HEPWORTH JAMES DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

8/9/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

8/9/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Substitution of Attorney

8/13/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OFF CALENDAR

8/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OFF CALENDAR

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/26/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/28/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Off Calendar); Filed by Ahang Zarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Ahang Zarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Lawrence C. Ecoff (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Lawrence C. Ecoff (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Feldman, Berman Schwartz, LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Defendant); Gary N. Schwartz (Defendant); Deborah Feldman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Feldman, Berman Schwartz, LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ahang Zarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ahang Zarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ahang Zarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ahang Zarin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FELDMAN BERMAN & SCHWARTZ LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEHJATNIA RUSSELL F. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ECOFF BLUT, LLP - LAWRENCE C. ECOFF