This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 00:44:45 (UTC).

A.H. A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JEFF SAVAGE VS MAYFLOWER HIGH SCHOOL, A PUBLIC HIGH SCHOOL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 A H A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JEFF SAVAGE filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAYFLOWER HIGH SCHOOL, A PUBLIC HIGH SCHOOL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0991

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

MCANDREW A PUBLIC EMPLOYEE AMANDA

BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC AGENCY

MAYFLOWER HIGH SCHOOL A PUBLIC HIGH SCHOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ROCHE ROBERT J.

Other Attorneys

OGRIN DEAN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S NOTICE OF TAKING OFFCALENDAR MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

1/13/2023: Notice - NOTICE BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S NOTICE OF TAKING OFFCALENDAR MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCH IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/5/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCH IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCH IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/5/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCH IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCH IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/5/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCH IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice - NOTICE BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

10/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

10/13/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCHE IN SUPPORT OF BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES- GENERAL, SET ONE AND REQUES

10/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCHE IN SUPPORT OF BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES- GENERAL, SET ONE AND REQUES

Separate Statement

10/10/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS FORM INTERROGATORIES- GENERAL, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

10/10/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS FORM INTERROGATORIES- GENERAL, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

10/10/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Separate Statement

10/10/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

10/10/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCHE IN SUPPORT OF BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCT

10/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCHE IN SUPPORT OF BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCHE IN SUPPORT OF BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND REQU

10/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. ROCHE IN SUPPORT OF BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND REQU

Separate Statement

10/10/2022: Separate Statement

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

10/3/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

8/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

Answer

7/22/2022: Answer

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2023
  • Hearing10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S NOTICE OF TAKING OFFCALENDAR MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; Filed by: Bellflower Unified School District, a public agency (Defendant); Amanda McAndrew, a public employee (Defendant); As to: A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Compelling Plaintiffs'' Responses to Defendants' Request for Production of Documents, Set One; Request for Monetary Sanctions scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Compelling Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Form Interrogatories - General, Set One; Request for Monetary Sanctions scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Compelling Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Request for Admissions, Set One; Request for Monetary Sanctions scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Compelling Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Form Interrogatories - General, Set One; Request for Monetary Sanctions: Name Extension changed from FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS FORM INTERROGATORIES- GENERAL, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS to - Compelling Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Form Interrogatories - General, Set One; Request for Monetary Sanctions ; As To Parties changed from A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff) to A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Compelling Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Request for Production of Documents, Set One; Request for Monetary Sanctions: Name Extension changed from FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS to - Compelling Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Request for Production of Documents, Set One; Request for Monetary Sanctions ; As To Parties changed from A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff) to A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for A.H.: Status Date changed from 10/26/2020 to 10/28/2020; Result Date changed from 10/28/2020 to 10/28/2020; As To Parties changed from Bellflower Unified School District, a public agency (Defendant), Amanda McAndrew, a public employee (Defendant), Mayflower High School, a public high school (Defendant) to A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for A.H.: Filed By: A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff); As to: Mayflower High School, a public high school (Defendant); Bellflower Unified School District, a public agency (Defendant); Amanda McAndrew, a public employee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff); As to: Mayflower High School, a public high school (Defendant); Bellflower Unified School District, a public agency (Defendant); Amanda McAndrew, a public employee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for A.H. Signed and Filed by: A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff); As to: A.H. a Minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Jeff Savage (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OGRIN DEAN