This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 05:40:08 (UTC).

AGUSTIN GARCIA VS NEW GLASPRO INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/21/2017 AGUSTIN GARCIA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NEW GLASPRO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4362

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA AGUSTIN

Defendants and Respondents

NEW GLASPRO INC.

GP MERGER SUB INC.

GLASPRO INC.

NEW GLASPRO INC. A HOLDING COMPANY FOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYAB DAVID ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GAGAS HOLLY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/20/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

DEFENDANT, GLASPRO, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER PLAINTIFF, AGUSTIN GARCIA'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

2/22/2018: DEFENDANT, GLASPRO, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER PLAINTIFF, AGUSTIN GARCIA'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

Unknown

2/22/2018: Unknown

GLASPRO, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/22/2018: GLASPRO, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEFENDANT, GLASPRO, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF, AGUSTIN GARCIA'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

2/22/2018: DEFENDANT, GLASPRO, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF, AGUSTIN GARCIA'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

Minute Order

3/2/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

3/12/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

PLAINTIFF AGUSTIN GARCIA'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GLASPRO, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

3/13/2018: PLAINTIFF AGUSTIN GARCIA'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GLASPRO, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF AGUSTIN GARCIA?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GLASPRO, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/13/2018: PLAINTIFF AGUSTIN GARCIA?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GLASPRO, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, GLASPRO, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF, AGUSTIN GARCIA'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

3/15/2018: DEFENDANT, GLASPRO, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF, AGUSTIN GARCIA'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, GLASPRO, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF, AGUSTIN GARCIA'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

3/15/2018: DEFENDANT, GLASPRO, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF, AGUSTIN GARCIA'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

3/26/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT, NEW GLASPRO INC. A HOLDING COMPANY FOR THE ASSETS G.P. MERGER SUB DBA GLASPRO INC.'S NOTICE OF ERRATA CONCERNING ITS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

3/28/2018: DEFENDANT, NEW GLASPRO INC. A HOLDING COMPANY FOR THE ASSETS G.P. MERGER SUB DBA GLASPRO INC.'S NOTICE OF ERRATA CONCERNING ITS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order

4/9/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

4/9/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REST PERIODS; 2. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION - DISPARATE TREATMENT; ETC.

4/18/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REST PERIODS; 2. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION - DISPARATE TREATMENT; ETC.

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Agustin Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Jury Trial ((12 DAYS)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Final Status Conference (***OFF/CAL-SETTLED***) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Jury Trial ((12 DAYS)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Jury Trial ((12 DAYS)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (of entire action.); Filed by Agustin Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Agustin Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Agustin Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REST PERIODS; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Agustin Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less