This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2023 at 14:19:20 (UTC).

AGUSTIN CORTES ROSALES VS ROGACIANO DIONISIO FERNANDO

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 AGUSTIN CORTES ROSALES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROGACIANO DIONISIO FERNANDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1559

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTES ROSALES AGUSTIN

Defendant

DIONISIO FERNANDO ROGACIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/24/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

1/24/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

1/24/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/24/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2025
  • Hearing01/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2024
  • Hearing07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2024
  • Hearing07/09/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AGUSTIN CORTES ROSALES (Plaintiff); As to: ROGACIANO DIONISIO FERNANDO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AGUSTIN CORTES ROSALES (Plaintiff); As to: ROGACIANO DIONISIO FERNANDO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AGUSTIN CORTES ROSALES (Plaintiff); As to: ROGACIANO DIONISIO FERNANDO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/09/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less