Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 21:09:30 (UTC).

AGUILERA, JANNETTE VS ALFARO, JUAN CARLOS

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 AGUILERA, JANNETTE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALFARO, JUAN CARLOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOSLEY, GIA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0044

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOSLEY, GIA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AGUILERA JANNETTE

Respondent

ALFARO JUAN CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

MARTINEZ-COUOH CARLOS

 

Court Documents

FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

4/1/2021: FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

3/12/2021: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

3/12/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Amended

2/8/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Amended

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

1/28/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons - served on 1/22/21

1/28/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - served on 1/22/21

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/29/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Declaration - Income and Expense

1/29/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/29/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Proof of Service - Mail

1/29/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

1/29/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/14/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

1/14/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/14/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Summons

1/14/2021: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/14/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Case Assignment

1/15/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/15/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department J at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (of Electronic Service ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (Change Child Custody ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (to Ex Parte Application ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Amended ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (served on 1/22/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ-COUOH CARLOS