Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 10:03:08 (UTC).

AGUILAR, LETICIA GUADALUPE VS AGUILAR, WILLIAMS ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 AGUILAR, LETICIA GUADALUPE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AGUILAR, WILLIAMS ANTONIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3430

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AGUILAR LETICIA GUADALUPE

Respondent

AGUILAR WILLIAMS ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SUA BRANDON MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request - Enter Default FL165

6/22/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

5/6/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons

5/6/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

3/29/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

3/29/2021: Summons

Declaration - Income and Expense

3/29/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/29/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/29/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/2/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

4/2/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUA BRANDON MICHAEL