This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2019 at 16:06:34 (UTC).

AGNES VARON ET AL VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 AGNES VARON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9373

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VARON ERIK

VARON AGNES

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS

SEMPRA ENERGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

STERN GLENN E. ESQ.

MALCZYNSKI MATTHEW PHILIP

Defendant Attorneys

HOWES MARLIN E. ESQ.

MAKINDE HANNAH JUSTINE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

10/29/2018: Case Management Order

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/24/2018: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

10/19/2018: Case Management Statement

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGLTHCE; 2, TRESPASS 3. PRIVATE NUISANCE 4. STRICT LIABILITY 5. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

8/24/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGLTHCE; 2, TRESPASS 3. PRIVATE NUISANCE 4. STRICT LIABILITY 5. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

1/10/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY TO COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS

9/28/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY TO COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT REGARDING DEFENDANT SEMPRA ENERGY

2/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT REGARDING DEFENDANT SEMPRA ENERGY

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GAURDIAN AD LITEM

2/6/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GAURDIAN AD LITEM

Minute Order

6/20/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/29/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/18/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/22/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

5/30/2018: Minute Order

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

6/11/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

6/11/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

6/11/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Of Doe Defendants) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dis...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by sempra Energy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Agnes Varon (Plaintiff); Erik Varon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Southern California gas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY TO COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GAURDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 12; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Agnes Varon (Plaintiff); Erik Varon (Plaintiff); Emily Varon (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Agnes Varon (Plaintiff); Erik Varon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

GLENN E. STERN SB # 84485

MATTHEW P. MALCZYNSKI SB # 271258

GLENN STERN LAW

333 West Foothill Boulevard

Glendora, CA 91741

Telephone: (626) 335-6844

Facsimile: (213) 232-7111

Attorneys for Plaintiff AGES VARON, et al.

ourt of California ofig‘t’vc nf Los Anaeles

FEB 23 2018

Sherri B. L kxecutive Officer/Clerk By %;%___ Deputy S ~-Rrsiden

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES-CENTRAL DISTRICT

AGNES VARON, an individual; ERIK VARON, an individudal; AGNES VARON, as Guardian ad Litem for minor EMILY VARON, an individual; AGNES VARON, as Guardian ad Litem for minor RYAN VARON, an individual,

Plaintiffs,

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS, A California Corporation, SEMPRA ENERGY, a California Corporation; and DOES 1-50,

Defendants.

“eaet e’

Case No.: BC689373

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT REGARDING DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS |

Assigned to the Honorable Elizabeth Feffer, Dept. 39 |

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Date: May 30, 2018 Time: 8:45 a.m. Dept. 39

Complaint filed: January 10, 2018 Tnal Date: None Set

TO THIS HONORABLE COURT AND TO ALL INTERESTED PARTIES:

PLEASE NOTE Proof of Service of Summons of Complaint Regarding Defendant

Southern California Gas as follows:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERN GLENN E.