Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 00:21:06 (UTC).

AGHDAS MIRNEZAMI,, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST SHAHNAZ AKHAVAN ZARABI, ET AL. VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 AGHDAS MIRNEZAMI,, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST SHAHNAZ AKHAVAN ZARABI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4280

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIRNEZAMI AGHDAS BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST SHAHNAZ AKHAVAN ZARABI

AKHAVAN ZARABI NADIEH

AKHAVAN ZARABI SHAHNAZ

Defendants

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NON-PROFIT

PENGHO HONORINE N.P.

CHARMS MATTHEW M.D.

BURROWS JAMES E. M.D.

NAIM M.D. ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KOU BRIAN ESQ.

GREENSLADE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/30/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2024
  • Hearing04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • Hearing09/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aghdas Mirnezami,, by and through her Successor-in-Interest Shahnaz Akhavan Zarabi (Plaintiff); Shahnaz Akhavan Zarabi (Plaintiff); Nadieh Akhavan Zarabi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aghdas Mirnezami,, by and through her Successor-in-Interest Shahnaz Akhavan Zarabi (Plaintiff); Shahnaz Akhavan Zarabi (Plaintiff); Nadieh Akhavan Zarabi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aghdas Mirnezami,, by and through her Successor-in-Interest Shahnaz Akhavan Zarabi (Plaintiff); Shahnaz Akhavan Zarabi (Plaintiff); Nadieh Akhavan Zarabi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC A CALIFORNIA... is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENSLADE MICHAEL VINCENT